Global Patent Index - EP 0718013 B1

EP 0718013 B1 2000-04-19 - Method for the treatment of ski edges etc.

Title (en)

Method for the treatment of ski edges etc.

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bearbeitung von Stahlkanten für Ski od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement des carres de skis etc.

Publication

EP 0718013 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95890206 A

Priority

AT 240594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718013A2] The ski edge hardening system uses a plasma beam for rapid heating of the ski edge, with subsequent rapid cooling to obtain the required hardening. An electric arc is obtained between the cathode and the anode electrode of the plasma head, through which a gas flow is passed to provide the plasma beam, the ski edge acting as the anode electrode. Pref. the plasma head and the ski edge are displaced relative to one another in the longitudinal direction of the ski edge for accurate determination of the energy supplied to the ski edge for regulation of the obtained hardness.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 11/06; C21D 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/048 (2006.01); A63C 11/06 (2006.01); B23K 10/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/09 (2006.01); H05H 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/06 (2013.01); Y10S 148/903 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718013 A2 19960626; EP 0718013 A3 19970806; EP 0718013 B1 20000419; AT 191860 T 20000515; AT 403805 B 19980525; AT A240594 A 19971015; DE 59508194 D1 20000525; JP H08238349 A 19960917; SI 0718013 T1 20000831; US 5762730 A 19980609

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111115

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191860 T

- Effective date: 20111115

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508194

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091115

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101104

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-09-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20100825

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508194 20000525

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19951122

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191860 T 20000515

2000-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FISCHER GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990520

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970902

1997-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1997-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 951122

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1996-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 951122

1996-06-26 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 951122