Global Patent Index - EP 0718052 B1

EP 0718052 B1 2000-07-19 - Die assembly for extruding hollow articles

Title (en)

Die assembly for extruding hollow articles

Title (de)

Matrize zum Strangpressen von Hohlkörpern

Title (fr)

Matrice d'extrusion de corps creux

Publication

EP 0718052 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94309524 A

Priority

EP 94309524 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718052A1] A male die (2) is composed of an annular base (7), a bridge (8) and a forming lug (9), and a female die (3) tightly fits in the annular base (7) of the corresponding male die (2). A distance between a forming slit (28) and a location where the male die (2) engages with the female die (3) is decreased such that the misalignment of the forming lug (9) with a forming hole (26) is prevented from occurring during an extrusion process. The male die in combination of the female die enables the production of hollow articles of a high dimensional precision free of any unevenness in wall thickness. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 25/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718052 A1 19960626; EP 0718052 B1 20000719; AT 194785 T 20000815; DE 69425329 D1 20000824; DE 69425329 T2 20010301

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021107

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-07-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011220

2001-12-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20001212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425329 20000824

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194785 T 20000815

1998-12-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981015

1997-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961209

1996-11-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE