Global patent index - EP 0718231 B1

EP 0718231 B1 2001-03-21 - Device for stacking sheets, in particular for paper- or paperboard sheets which are fed in overlapping streams

Title (en)

Device for stacking sheets, in particular for paper- or paperboard sheets which are fed in overlapping streams

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Stapeln von Bögen, insbesondere von geschuppt zugeförderten Papier- oder Kartonbögen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour empiler des feuilles, en particulier pour des feuilles en papier ou carton qui sont alimentées en se chevauchant

Publication

EP 0718231 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116607 A

Priority

DE 4445994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718231A2] The belt conveyor of the stacking device terminates with a gap in front of the stacking area, and the auxiliary stacking platform is formed as a bar grate. A separating element (14,16) is located in the free space between the end of the conveyor and stacking area. The separating plates (14) are located with the separating fingers (16) over the working width staggered in relation to the rods of the grate, and the length of the plate is greater than the vertical distance between the feed plane of the sheet (1) and the entry plane of the grate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 31/32 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42256 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42264 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42622 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718231 A2 19960626; EP 0718231 A3 19970625; EP 0718231 B1 20010321; DE 4445994 A1 19960627; DE 4445994 C2 19970116; ES 2159592 T3 20011016; JP H08225226 A 19960903; US 5628505 A 19970513; US 5664767 A 19970909

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121022

2014-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140116

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121021

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59509111

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121021

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121021

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101022

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-06-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2159592

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59509111

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-02-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991001

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961011

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT