Global Patent Index - EP 0718396 B1

EP 0718396 B1 2001-02-28 - Lubricant for metal forming

Title (en)

Lubricant for metal forming

Title (de)

Schmiermittel für die Metallumformung

Title (fr)

Lubrifiant pour la déformation des métaux

Publication

EP 0718396 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118194 A

Priority

  • DE 4445993 A
  • US 13780498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718396A1] A lubricant concentrate (I) for cold-forming metals contains (a) 20-50 pts. wt. polyethylene with a softening pt. above 120 degrees C. and a particle size of 0.1-50 mu m, (b) 2-8 pts. wt. polyacrylate with a mol. wt. of 4500-10,000 and (c) 2-8 pts. wt. styrene/acrylic acid copolymer with a mol. wt. of 150,000-250,000 and a Tg of 45-55 degrees C., with the acrylic acid components of (b) and (c) mainly present under usage conditions in the form of salts of inorganic cations, and the softening pts. of the different polymers distributed over the range between ambient temp. and 200 degrees C. Also claimed is a process for facilitating the cold forming of metal parts by applying a film of lubricant with the aid of concentrate (I), the film being applied from an aq. dispersion with a solids content of 5-25 wt.%.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/041 (2013.01); C10M 2201/042 (2013.01); C10M 2201/066 (2013.01); C10M 2201/085 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2205/022 (2013.01); C10M 2205/04 (2013.01); C10M 2205/14 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/108 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10N 2220/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/402 (2013.01); C10N 2240/403 (2013.01); C10N 2240/404 (2013.01); C10N 2240/405 (2013.01); C10N 2240/406 (2013.01); C10N 2240/407 (2013.01); C10N 2240/408 (2013.01); C10N 2240/409 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 173/02 + C10M 143/02 + C10M 145/14 + C10M 145/14 + C10M 143/10 + C10M 145/36 + C10M 145/28
  2. C10M 2209/084 + C10M 2209/084

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718396 A1 19960626; EP 0718396 B1 20010228; DE 4445993 A1 19960627; US 6034041 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 199387

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20151118

2015-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-11-19 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20151117

2015-11-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59509060

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-11-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011118

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59509060

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-03-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199387

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-01-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEMETALL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990315

1999-01-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METALLGESELLSCHAFT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961227

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI LU NL SE