Global patent index - EP 0718410 B1

EP 0718410 B1 2001-03-28 - Process for producing rocker arms

Title (en)

Process for producing rocker arms

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Kipphebeln

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de leviers oscillants

Publication

EP 0718410 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94309203 A

Priority

  • EP 94309203 A
  • JP 24959593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718410A1] In producing a rocker arm (25, 26), the following steps are used: fabricating a rocker arm blank (79) which includes: a rocker arm body (77) having an aperture (36a) therein adapted to be converted to a hole (36) for the insertion of a shaft (24), and which blank (79) is made of a nitrided steel comprising specified amounts of C, Mn, Cr, Al, Si, P, S, Cu, Ni, one of Pb and Bi, and optionally Mo, and, as the balance, substantially Fe; and a slipper surface forming piece (41); subjecting the rocker arm blank (79) to a refining treatment to adjust its hardness; subjecting the apertures (36a) to reaming to form the shaft insertion holes (36); and subjecting the rocker arm blank (79) with the shaft insertion holes (36) formed therein to a nitriding treatment. Thus, it is possible to mass-produce rocker arms (25, 26) for an internal combustion engine, each of which has excellent mechanical properties. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/78; C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/78 (2006.01); C21D 9/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C23C 8/26 (2006.01); F01L 1/18 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01); C21D 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/0068 (2013.01); C21D 1/78 (2013.01); F01L 1/181 (2013.01); F01L 1/267 (2013.01); C21D 1/18 (2013.01); F01L 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718410 A1 19960626; EP 0718410 B1 20010328; JP 3411637 B2 20030603; JP H07102322 A 19950418

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131209

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131209

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121205

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-09-12 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20120820

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071206

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2004-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69426982

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990304

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950814

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB