Global Patent Index - EP 0718440 B1

EP 0718440 B1 2000-05-31 - Elastic article of plastic material for floor covering

Title (en)

Elastic article of plastic material for floor covering

Title (de)

Elastisches Kunststoffelement zum Bilden eines Bodenbelages

Title (fr)

Elément élastique en matière plastique pour revêtement de sol

Publication

EP 0718440 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116398 A

Priority

CH 382494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718440A1] The plastics element has male coupling members (9) which project from the outer frame (1) as elongated bars parallel to the plane of the element. Each female coupling element (13) lying within the outer frame has two spring-elastic catches (14,15) which grip behind the bar (9). The elongated bar has a stop (10) for the two catches. The stop is made as a plate which protrudes over the face side of the bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 13/04; E01C 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 5/20 (2006.01); E01C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 13/045 (2013.01); E01C 5/20 (2013.01); E04F 15/105 (2013.01); E04F 15/107 (2013.01); E01C 2201/12 (2013.01); Y10T 403/16 (2013.01); Y10T 403/553 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718440 A1 19960626; EP 0718440 B1 20000531; AT 193572 T 20000615; AU 4047995 A 19960627; AU 686482 B2 19980205; CA 2165391 A1 19960620; CA 2165391 C 19990420; CN 1132300 A 19961002; DE 59508421 D1 20000706; ES 2145863 T3 20000716; KR 0176288 B1 19990401; NO 955143 A 19960620; NO 955143 D0 19951218; PT 718440 E 20000929; SG 34333 A1 19961206; TW 294750 B 19970101; US 5628160 A 19970513

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101019

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101018

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071018

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080418

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071018

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071018

2008-05-05 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080418

2006-09-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-20 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060911

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060907

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145863 T3

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508421 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193572 T 20000615

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990701

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960629

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE