Global Patent Index - EP 0718453 B1

EP 0718453 B1 2001-02-28 - Floor-shuttering

Title (en)

Floor-shuttering

Title (de)

Schalung für eine Betondecke

Title (fr)

Coffrage de dalle

Publication

EP 0718453 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104314 A

Priority

  • DE 4237516 A
  • EP 93922495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5683609A] PCT No. PCT/DE93/00982 Sec. 371 Date May 2, 1995 Sec. 102(e) Date May 2, 1995 PCT Filed Oct. 13, 1993 PCT Pub. No. WO94/11594 PCT Pub. Date May 26, 1994The invention concerns a support for ceiling mold elements for concrete. It is effected in that, on both edges of its upper surface (2, 48) one row each of projections (3, 4, 53, 54) is provided for, the projections protruding upwardly and outwardly at separations from another and being suited for securing or attaching the ceiling mold elements (11, 29, 30) and in that the spaces between the projections (3, 4, 53, 54) correspond to twice the separation of an abutment, arranged on the underside of the mold element, from the edge of the mold element, and in that the distance between the projections (3, 4, 53, 54) matches the corresponding dimension of the mold element (11, 29, 30) to be placed in, or a fraction of this dimension. The invention furthermore provides for the surfaces of the support to be at least partially covered with a plastic cover strip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 11/38; E04G 11/48; E04G 11/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/38 (2006.01); E04G 11/48 (2006.01); E04G 11/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 11/50 (2013.01); E04G 11/38 (2013.01); E04G 11/48 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 4848049 A 19890718 - HANSON GLENN R [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5683609 A 19971104; DE 4237516 A1 19940511; DE 59304923 D1 19970206; DE 59310149 D1 20010405; EP 0670944 A1 19950913; EP 0670944 B1 19961227; EP 0718453 A2 19960626; EP 0718453 A3 19961016; EP 0718453 B1 20010228; ES 2098062 T3 19970416; ES 2156964 T3 20010801; JP 3242661 B2 20011225; JP H08503036 A 19960402; WO 9411594 A1 19940526

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121014

2014-01-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140115

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121013

2013-08-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59310149

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121013

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121013

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156964

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-07-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-05-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-05-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59310149

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-02-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 670944

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-03-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: FLOOR-SHUTTERING

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981216

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1996-10-16 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: E04G 11/38

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960319

1996-06-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 670944

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT