Global Patent Index - EP 0718455 B1

EP 0718455 B1 2000-09-06 - Vehicle door lock

Title (en)

Vehicle door lock

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugtürschloss

Title (fr)

Serrure de porte de véhicule

Publication

EP 0718455 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95120047 A

Priority

IT TO940261 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718455A1] A vehicle door lock (1) presenting a lock mechanism (3); an outside release lever (5); a safety lever (8) movable between a first stable position disabling outside release, and a second stable position enabling outside release; and an inside release lever (6) movable between a first idle position (a), and a second position (b) wherein it cooperates with and releases the lock mechanism (3); the safety lever (8) presenting a shaped slot (22) engaged in sliding manner by a pin (21) on the inside release lever (6), so that the safety lever (8) is moved between the first and second stable positions when the inside release lever (6) is rotated between the idle position (a) and a third intermediate position (c). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01); E05B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/12 (2013.01); E05B 13/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718455 A1 19960626; EP 0718455 B1 20000906; BR 9505458 A 19971028; DE 69518727 D1 20001012; DE 69518727 T2 20010531; ES 2151017 T3 20001216; IT 232602 Y1 20000110; IT TO940261 U1 19960624; IT TO940261 V0 19941223; PL 177707 B1 20000131; PL 312025 A1 19960624

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131219

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69518727

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69518727

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130107

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051220

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-12-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051220

2005-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-06-01 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

- Effective date: 20010606

2005-01-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-12-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-10-20 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-07-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-06-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INTIER AUTOMOTIVE EYBL (GERMANY) GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151017

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518727

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-10-12

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATOMA ROLTRA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980922

1998-10-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATOMA ROLTRA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961220

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT