Global Patent Index - EP 0718457 B1

EP 0718457 B1 2000-02-09 - Fitting assembly for pivoting or pivoting and tilting wings

Title (en)

Fitting assembly for pivoting or pivoting and tilting wings

Title (de)

Beschlagsystem für Schwenk- oder Schwenkkippflügel

Title (fr)

Ensemble de ferrure pour ailes pivotantes ou oscillo-battantes

Publication

EP 0718457 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118070 A

Priority

DE 9420655 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718457A1] The fittings system has two metal fitting units (16,18) arranged in the rabbet region (34) between the leaf frame shank (35) and the opposite blind frame shank (36). One unit (16) is securable to the leaf frame (5) and the other to the blind frame (12). The two metal fitting units form a pair of boundary surfaces (19-22) running vertically to the longitudinal extension of the two frame shanks.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/00; E06B 5/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/5214 (2013.01); E05D 11/0018 (2013.01); E05D 11/0027 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/146 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 9420655 U1 19960201; AT 189729 T 20000215; EP 0718457 A1 19960626; EP 0718457 B1 20000209

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-11-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-11-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-01-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-11-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507783 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189729 T 20000215

2000-01-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1997-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970204

1997-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961223

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT