Global Patent Index - EP 0718478 B1

EP 0718478 B1 2001-04-04 - Device to treat the exhaust gases of a diesel engine comprising a catalytic converter and an adsorber of nitrogen oxydes, placed in the exhaust manifold

Title (en)

Device to treat the exhaust gases of a diesel engine comprising a catalytic converter and an adsorber of nitrogen oxydes, placed in the exhaust manifold

Title (de)

Abgasbehandlungsvorrichtung einer Dieselbrennkraftmaschine mit einem Katalysator und einem Stickoxydenadsorber, die in Abgaskrümmer angeordnet sind

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traitement des gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à allumage par compression comportant un catalyseur et un adsorbeur d'oxydes d'azote placés dans le collecteur d'échappement

Publication

EP 0718478 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402671 A

Priority

FR 9415264 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718478A1] The exhaust gases from a diesel engine are treated to remove nitrous oxides. Treatment occurs in a catalytic converter (12) positioned in the inlet to the exhaust pipe (8a). The catalyst is surrounded by a gas collection chamber (3) which contains an adsorber (15) of oxides of nitrogen. Exhaust gases circulate turbulently through this chamber in contact with the adsorber, then pass through the catalyst.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28; B01D 53/04; F01N 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/94 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01); F01N 13/02 (2010.01); F01N 13/04 (2010.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/9481 (2013.01); F01N 3/0814 (2013.01); F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F01N 13/009 (2014.06); F01N 13/011 (2014.06); F01N 2250/12 (2013.01); F01N 2330/08 (2013.01); F01N 2330/10 (2013.01); F01N 2470/12 (2013.01); F01N 2470/14 (2013.01); F01N 2470/18 (2013.01); F01N 2470/24 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); Y02C 20/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718478 A1 19960626; EP 0718478 B1 20010404; DE 69520555 D1 20010510; DE 69520555 T2 20011129; FR 2728300 A1 19960621; FR 2728300 B1 19970314; US 6941749 B1 20050913

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091127

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081127

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-02-07 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20070117

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-06-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520555 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991209

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960415

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT