Global Patent Index - EP 0718504 B1

EP 0718504 B1 2000-05-03 - Mono-block hydraulic control system

Title (en)

Mono-block hydraulic control system

Title (de)

Hydraulische Steuervorrichtung in Monoblockbauweise

Title (fr)

Système de commande hydraulique mono-bloc

Publication

EP 0718504 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118187 A

Priority

DE 4446144 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718504A2] A hydraulic control device for raising and lowering a load uses at least two solenoid-driven proportional valves (90,120) and a pressure balance as input for raising the load irrespective of its size. The elements are all in a housing with at least one pump connector, one load connector and one return connector. The valves are in parallel and the electromagnetic drive (91,121) are on the same side, at the same level. The pressure balance (70) is located coaxially by the first valve. There is a channel (55) joining the valves, splitting into two sections (57,58) which intersect the cylinder where the slider (97) of the first valve moves. The slider has control edges (101,102) which can block off the return channel (94).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 13/01 (2006.01); F15B 13/044 (2006.01); F16K 11/10 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718504 A2 19960626; EP 0718504 A3 19970122; EP 0718504 B1 20000503; DE 4446144 A1 19960627; JP 3639657 B2 20050420; JP H08233147 A 19960910

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508271

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-11-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051118

2001-07-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001118

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001118

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508271 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990721

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970722

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT