Global Patent Index - EP 0718549 B1

EP 0718549 B1 2003-06-25 - Fixing device

Title (en)

Fixing device

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation

Publication

EP 0718549 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95119255 A

Priority

DE 9420582 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718549A1] A fastener for an object to a wall using pre-installed screws (5) which are not fully screwed in has at least one pair of rails (2) on the object along which at least one shim plate (3) can slide. The shim plate has a cutaway (6) to accommodate the shank of the screw. There is a square hole in the object(4) per pair of rails, sited midway between them and large enough so that the screw head can pass through. The cutaway extends across the full rail separation. It is shaped to provide a slot (6a) whose width (ie transversely) is larger than the screw head diameter and whose length (ie, longitudinally) is smaller, but still larger than the shank diameter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 21/02; F16B 21/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 9420582 U1 19950216; EP 0718549 A1 19960626; EP 0718549 B1 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081206

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071206

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071206

2008-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-12-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061207

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-12-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061205

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510730 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010829

1996-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960719

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL