Global Patent Index - EP 0718558 B1

EP 0718558 B1 2001-04-18 - Combustor

Title (en)

Combustor

Title (de)

Brennkammer

Title (fr)

Brûleur

Publication

EP 0718558 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810761 A

Priority

DE 4446611 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718558A2] The combustion chamber is in the form of an annular combustion chamber (1) in which the turbulent flow generator (200) has three free surfaces subject to flow. One surface is the roof surface (210) and the other two are side surfaces (211, 213). The side surfaces are joined to the same wall segment of the feed flow channel (5) and together enclose an acute angle (alpha). The roof surface lies against the same wall segment with an edge (215) running transversely to the flow channel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/12; F23R 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/08 (2006.01); F23D 23/00 (2006.01); F23M 9/02 (2006.01); F23R 3/02 (2006.01); F23R 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 23/00 (2013.01); F23M 9/02 (2013.01); F23R 3/02 (2013.01); F23R 3/12 (2013.01); F23R 2900/03341 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718558 A2 19960626; EP 0718558 A3 19970423; EP 0718558 B1 20010418; CN 1076786 C 20011226; CN 1130718 A 19960911; DE 4446611 A1 19960627; JP 3977454 B2 20070919; JP H08226647 A 19960903; US 5609030 A 19970311

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101205

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101205

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20101025

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091230

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091106

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-10-31 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2003-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2003-05-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ABB SCHWEIZ HOLDING AG

2003-02-05 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509206 20010523

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990818

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970913

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1997-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL