Global Patent Index - EP 0718559 B1

EP 0718559 B1 2000-01-05 - Fuel distribution system for the injection heads of a double annular combustor

Title (en)

Fuel distribution system for the injection heads of a double annular combustor

Title (de)

Brennstoffverteilungssystem für die Einspritzköpfe einer Doppelringbrennkammer

Title (fr)

Système d'injection d'une chambre de combustion à deux têtes

Publication

EP 0718559 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402625 A

Priority

FR 9414013 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718559A1] The combustion chamber includes a pilot combustion head (26) with a series of low-speed injectors (23), and an auxiliary combustion head (25) with a further series of injectors spaced radially from the pilot head. A fuel supply circuit (28) delivers fuel to the pilot injectors. The auxiliary injectors are supplied with fuel by a first circuit (42) and by a second circuit (43). At low load levels the second circuit delivers fuel direct to the combustion chamber. At low load levels the fuel/air mixture in the main region of the combustion chamber is at least 80 per cent of the stoichiometric rate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2727192 A1 19960524; FR 2727192 B1 19961220; DE 69514320 D1 20000210; DE 69514320 T2 20000824; EP 0718559 A1 19960626; EP 0718559 B1 20000105; US 5634328 A 19970603

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141122

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141122

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69514320

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120517 AND 20120523

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-02-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514320 20000210

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980212

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951220

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB