Global patent index - EP 0718560 B1

EP 0718560 B1 2000-01-05 - Staged combustor where full load injectors also containing idling injectors

Title (en)

Staged combustor where full load injectors also containing idling injectors

Title (de)

Stufenbrennkammer, deren Vollastbrenner auch Leerlaufbrenner enthalten

Title (fr)

Chambre de combustion à deux têtes fonctionnant du ralenti au plein gaz

Publication

EP 0718560 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402626 A

Priority

FR 9414014 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718560A1] The chamber has axial walls (1) and a base panel, with a series of fuel injectors arranged to define a pilot head (20) and an auxiliary take-off head (21) radially spaced from each other. The pilot head has a series of low-speed injectors (22) of a given permeability rate. The auxiliary head has the same number of low-speed injectors (23) of equal permeability, and an equal number of injectors (24) of higher permeability, arranged in alternation around the circumference of the head. The auxiliary head is located radially outside the pilot head, with a further head including air inlets (9a,b), of two alternating sizes corresponding to the two injection heads, located radially outside both.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/34; F23R 3/10; F23R 3/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/10 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01); F23R 3/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/50 (2013.01); F23R 3/10 (2013.01); F23R 3/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2727193 A1 19960524; FR 2727193 B1 19961220; DE 69514321 D1 20000210; DE 69514321 T2 20000608; EP 0718560 A1 19960626; EP 0718560 B1 20000105; US 5642621 A 19970701

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141122

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141122

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69514321

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131025

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120517 AND 20120523

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514321

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980722

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951220

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB