Global Patent Index - EP 0718561 B1

EP 0718561 B1 2001-03-14 - Combustor

Title (en)

Combustor

Title (de)

Brennkammer

Title (fr)

Brûleur

Publication

EP 0718561 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810763 A

Priority

DE 4446541 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718561A2] The combustion chamber has a first stage (1) with a burner (100) to produce a hot gas (4). Downstream of the burner are arranged turbulent flow generators (200-202). Downstream of the turbulent flow generators a gaseous and/or liquid fuel (9) can be injected into the main flow. The second stage (2) in the flow direction has a cross sectional step widening (12) which indicates the initial flow cross section of the second stage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/34; F23R 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 3/14 (2006.01); F23C 6/04 (2006.01); F23C 99/00 (2006.01); F23M 9/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/12 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01); F23R 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/34 (2013.01); F23C 6/047 (2013.01); F23M 9/00 (2013.01); F23R 3/12 (2013.01); F23C 2900/07002 (2013.01); F23R 2900/03341 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718561 A2 19960626; EP 0718561 A3 19970423; EP 0718561 B1 20010314; CA 2164482 A1 19960625; CN 1133393 A 19961016; DE 4446541 A1 19960627; JP H08226649 A 19960903

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151204

2015-12-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20151204

2015-12-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59509091

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 59509091

- Effective date: 20120621

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59509091

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120621

2002-06-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509091 20010419

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB (SCHWEIZ) AG

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990818

1997-11-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970913

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT