Global Patent Index - EP 0718564 B1

EP 0718564 B1 2000-07-19 - Portable air-conditioning equipment

Title (en)

Portable air-conditioning equipment

Title (de)

Tragbares Klimagerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de climatisation portable

Publication

EP 0718564 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95201382 A

Priority

IT MI940851 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718564A2] Portable air-conditioning equipment (1) which requires an unusually small space for its installation, comprises, in a casing (7), a grille (10) for the intake of air from the environment, a grille (12) for the output of cold air, a hot-air outlet (14) facing upwardly and a flexible tube (15) extending from the hot-air outlet (14) to a free end (17) intended to be associated with a window. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/02 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718564 A2 19960626; EP 0718564 A3 19970312; EP 0718564 B1 20000719; DE 69518059 D1 20000824; DE 69518059 T2 20010329; ES 2149921 T3 20001116; IT 234305 Y1 20000309; IT MI940851 U1 19960624; IT MI940851 V0 19941222

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090526

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100129

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149921

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69518059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-07-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980629

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970424

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1996-10-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARRIER S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT