EP 0718813 A3 19971001 - An automated teller machine
Title (en)
An automated teller machine
Title (de)
Automatischer Bankschalter-Kassenautomat
Title (fr)
Guichet de banque automatique
Publication
Application
Priority
GB 9424558 A 19941206
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0718813A2] An automated teller machine (ATM) (10) incorporating a control means (12) and a user interface (14) having a touch screen display means (16). The ATM (10) is arranged to present a display (30) on the display means (16) presenting two or more service options to a user. Decisions regarding the available service options are input by touching areas (32-44) of the display (30). The requests for decisions are presented in the form of a grammatical sentence which guides the user through the transaction. Also, amendments can be made simply by returning to the service option concerned and re-entering the amended decision. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G06Q 40/00 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01); G07F 19/205 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 4134537 A 19790116 - GLASER PAUL F, et al
- [Y] EP 0574254 A2 19931215 - FUJITSU LTD [JP]
- [A] EP 0284764 A2 19881005 - IBM [US]
- [A] US 5235509 A 19930810 - MUELLER RAYMOND J [US], et al
- [A] US 4449186 A 19840515 - KELLY GUY M [US], et al
- [A] US 4761542 A 19880802 - KUBO YUJI [JP], et al
- [A] US 5201034 A 19930406 - MATSUURA MASAYOSHI [US], et al
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 101 (P - 273) 12 May 1984 (1984-05-12)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 002 (P - 652) 7 January 1988 (1988-01-07)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 034 (P - 662) 2 February 1988 (1988-02-02)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE ES FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0718813 A2 19960626; EP 0718813 A3 19971001; EP 0718813 B1 19990407; DE 69508902 D1 19990512; DE 69508902 T2 19990916; ES 2132541 T3 19990816; GB 9424558 D0 19950125; JP H08241452 A 19960917
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 95308637 A 19951130; DE 69508902 T 19951130; ES 95308637 T 19951130; GB 9424558 A 19941206; JP 34433995 A 19951206