EP 0718912 A1 19960626 - Antenna
Title (en)
Antenna
Title (de)
Antenne
Title (fr)
Antenne
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 4446128 A 19941223
Abstract (en)
The antenna has at least 3 individual elements lying parallel to one another, perpendicular to a given propagation direction, acting as a common radiator (S) with directors (D11, D12, D13; D21, D22, D23) arranged symmetrically on both sides of it, providing opposing propagation directions. A reflective surface provided by the antenna housing extends parallel to the given propagation direction and to the individual antenna elements, the latter provided via a planar technique on a common substrate (Sub).
Abstract (de)
Techn. Problem:: Antennenanordnung für "Funkschlauch" (Häuserschlucht, Bahnlinie, Autobahn) soll gebündelt bidirektional strahlen. Stand der Technik:: Zwei getrennte Yagis, die getrennt zu montieren und separat zu speisen sind. Grundgedanke:: Gemeinsamer Strahler (S) mit Direktoren (D11, D12, D13; D21, D22, D23) auf beiden Seiten. Beispiel:: Strahler und beidseits davon Direktoren in planarer Technik auf gemeinsamem Substrat. Breitbandiger Strahlerdipol mit symmetrischer Einspeisung. Gehäuse als Reflektor parallel zum Substrat. Vorteil:: Leicht handhabbar, unauffällig, kostengünstig <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H01Q 9/28 (2006.01); H01Q 19/30 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
H01Q 9/285 (2013.01); H01Q 19/30 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] US 3518673 A 19700630 - HAKONSEN OLE PETTER
- [A] US 4812855 A 19890314 - COE RICHARD J [US], et al
- [A] US 5293172 A 19940308 - LAMBERTY BERNARD J [US], et al
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 343 (E - 796) 2 August 1989 (1989-08-02)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 18, no. 318 (E - 1562) 16 June 1994 (1994-06-16)
- [A] NESIC ET AL.: "BROADBAND TWO-DIMENSIONAL PRINTED ANTENNA ARRAY", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS 20TH EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE 90, vol. 1, 10 September 1990 (1990-09-10) - 13 September 1990 (1990-09-13), BUDAPEST,HUNGARY, pages 252 - 256, XP000326962
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE ES FR GB IT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0718912 A1 19960626; DE 4446128 A1 19960627; FI 956250 A0 19951222; FI 956250 A 19960624
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 95120274 A 19951221; DE 4446128 A 19941223; FI 956250 A 19951222