Global Patent Index - EP 0718914 B1

EP 0718914 B1 2001-05-23 - Electrical connection box

Title (en)

Electrical connection box

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschlussdose

Title (fr)

Boîte de raccordement électrique

Publication

EP 0718914 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95118776 A

Priority

JP 32002594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0718914A2] In order to provide a small size electrical connection box in which wires can be arranged with an improved degree of freedom and which can sufficiently cope with a complicated wiring, wires W are arranged at two vertical stages in a space defined by an upper casing 11 and a lower casing 12, and are electrically connected with cramping terminals 20 pressed and secured in the casings 11 and 12. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24; H01R 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/24 (2006.01); H01R 29/00 (2006.01); H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/506 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2458 (2013.01); H01R 29/00 (2013.01); H01R 4/2429 (2013.01); H01R 13/506 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0718914 A2 19960626; EP 0718914 A3 19970625; EP 0718914 B1 20010523; CN 1133501 A 19961016; DE 69521013 D1 20010628; DE 69521013 T2 20011108

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2006-11-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-07-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2002-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011113

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69521013 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990222

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970416

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB