Global Patent Index - EP 0719224 B1

EP 0719224 B1 2000-01-19 - TRAFFIC CONTROL SYSTEM TO CONTROL OPERATIONS AND TRAFFIC FLOW IN RAIL TRANSPORT

Title (en)

TRAFFIC CONTROL SYSTEM TO CONTROL OPERATIONS AND TRAFFIC FLOW IN RAIL TRANSPORT

Title (de)

VERKEHRSLEITSYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG DES FAHRBETRIEBES UND DES VERKEHRSABLAUFES FÜR DEN SCHIENENGEBUNDENEN VERKEHR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE PILOTER LE FONCTIONNEMENT ET L'ECOULEMENT DU TRAFIC FERROVIAIRE

Publication

EP 0719224 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94927600 A

Priority

  • DE 4331431 A
  • EP 9403032 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9507832A1] The invention relates to a traffic control system to ensure the safety of trains and sections in rail transport using traffic logistics data. In the traffic control system of the invention, a hierarchical computer system acquires all data relating to safety and other factors. There is a vehicle computer aboard every vehicle which is connected to the other vehicle computers, section installations and the overriding control computer and the master computer, preferably via a radio-supported computer network. The necessary actions for securing the section and safe running are derived from the data provided for the locomotive drive at his/her post. This traffic control system is especially suitable for the complex and economical running of rail traffic on single-track sections and for regional traffic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 23/22; B61L 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 23/22 (2006.01); B61L 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 23/22 (2013.01); B61L 27/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4331431 C1 19950302; AT 188930 T 20000215; EP 0719224 A1 19960703; EP 0719224 B1 20000119; WO 9507832 A1 19950323

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2004-11-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-09-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010909

2001-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INTEGRALE SICHERUNGS- UND INFORMATIONSSYSTEME G.M.

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000927

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-09-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000918

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-07-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-05-05 [ET1] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** REVISION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE PATENT OR THE CLAIMS

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409091 20000224

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL

2000-01-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188930 T 20000215

1998-07-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSY INTEGRALE SICHERUNGS- UND INFORMATIONSSYSTEME

1998-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971201

1996-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960314

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR NL