Global Patent Index - EP 0719508 B1

EP 0719508 B1 2000-03-29 - Knit slide fastener

Title (en)

Knit slide fastener

Title (de)

Gewirkter Reissverschluss

Title (fr)

Fermeture à glissière tricotée

Publication

EP 0719508 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95109050 A

Priority

JP 34093694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719508A2] A knit slide fastener including a fastener tape (1) composed of a warp-knit ground structure including chain stitches, and a row of cntinuous coupling elements (5) knit into and along an element-supporting portion (2) of the fastener tape (1) as the fastener tape (1) is knit, wherein a plurality of threads (10) are knit into the element-supporting portion (2) as binding chain stitches, so as to form a group of successive longitudinally interlocked needle loops appearing on the front side and arranged such that in every two adjacent courses (4), the preceding needle loop (12a) overlies an upper leg (6) of one coupling element (5), and the succeeding needle loop (12b) is disposed in a space between the coupling element (5) and an adjacent coupling element (5) at a position close to the ground structure so as to bend or flex the preceding needle loop (12a) into an inverted U shape extending embracingly over the upper and lower legs (6, 7) of the coupling element (5). With this arrangement, the row of coupling elements (5) can be firmly secured to the ground structure of the fastener tape (1) with high dimensional stability, and can always retain a stable attachment posture to insure the functions required in the slide fastener. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 19/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/56 (2006.01); A44B 19/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/343 (2013.01); D04B 21/16 (2013.01); D10B 2501/0631 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719508 A2 19960703; EP 0719508 A3 19970205; EP 0719508 B1 20000329; BR 9502250 A 19970805; CN 1084179 C 20020508; CN 1124122 A 19960612; DE 69515974 D1 20000504; DE 69515974 T2 20001109; ES 2143566 T3 20000516; HK 1010638 A1 20001201; JP 3338996 B2 20021028; JP H08182512 A 19960716; KR 0134678 B1 19980418; TW 319024 U 19971101

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150613

2015-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150925

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150611

2015-07-01 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150611

2015-06-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69515974

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140609

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140603

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140617

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140513

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MATSUDA, YOSHIO * KATO, HIDENOBU * IKEGUCHI, YOSHITO

2000-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143566 T3

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515974 20000504

2000-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990608

1997-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970515

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT