Global Patent Index - EP 0719657 B1

EP 0719657 B1 2000-03-22 - Expansible file

Title (en)

Expansible file

Title (de)

Ausdehnbarer Schriftgutbehälter

Title (fr)

Chemise à sangle pour le classement de documents

Publication

EP 0719657 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95420369 A

Priority

FR 9416020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719657A1] The file consists of top and bottom panels (3,2) connected by a spine of variable width, depending on the thickness of the documents contained in the file. Each of the panels has a tunnel (4) in it for a strap (7) which passes round the spine and the opposite end of the file to hold it closed. The file has a series of inner folders (9) which are stuck together apart from narrow strips (14) adjacent to their folds (13) to provide the accordion effect. The free edges of the folders are cut to make an index for the filed documents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719657 A1 19960703; EP 0719657 B1 20000322; DE 69515829 D1 20000427; DE 69515829 T2 20010125; FR 2728829 A1 19960705; FR 2728829 B1 19970321

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081228

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081228

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071211

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ARIANEX SYSTEMES

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515829 20000427

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB LI NL

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

1998-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980605

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970102

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB LI NL