Global Patent Index - EP 0719702 B1

EP 0719702 B1 2000-01-05 - Fin with trailing edge fixed flaps for ships

Title (en)

Fin with trailing edge fixed flaps for ships

Title (de)

Tragflügel mit festen Hinterkantenflossen für Schiffe

Title (fr)

Aileron à volets fixes au bord de fuite pour navires

Publication

EP 0719702 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95400981 A

Priority

FR 9415881 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719702A1] The aileron comprises a principal aileron (1) having one or several pairs of flaps (2a,2b) fixed to the trailing edge. The fixed flaps are symmetrically located on the inner (1a) and outer (1b) surfaces of the aileron. The flaps are placed towards the trailing edge of the aileron so that tangents to their mean curvature at the leading edge are parallel or oblique to the aileron mean plane. The connection of the pairs of flaps to the aileron is obtained by means of plates and braces (5a,5b,5c...5f) located along the flaps. The assembly of aileron, flaps and spacers constitute the stabilising aileron.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 39/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/26 (2006.01); B63B 39/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 39/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719702 A1 19960703; EP 0719702 B1 20000105; AT 188426 T 20000115; DE 69514322 D1 20000210; DE 69514322 T2 20010125; DK 0719702 T3 20000626; ES 2144586 T3 20000616; FI 110421 B 20030131; FI 952369 A0 19950516; FI 952369 A 19960630; FR 2728864 A1 19960705; FR 2728864 B1 19970314; GR 3033139 T3 20000831; JP H0924893 A 19970128; KR 100412927 B1 20040320; NO 309080 B1 20001211; NO 951776 A 19960102; NO 951776 D0 19950505; US 5588391 A 19961231

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150427

2015-06-24 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20000400832

- Effective date: 20150429

2015-06-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-05-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150427

2015-05-04 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20150428

2015-04-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69514322

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140411

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140506

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140522

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-06-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2005-05-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: FOURE LAGADEC

2005-02-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-02-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-11-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2000-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ACH ENGINEERING

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-06-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144586 T3

2000-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000430

2000-04-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000404

2000-04-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-03-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514322 20000210

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188426 T 20000115

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACH ENGINEERING

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980625

1996-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950502

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE