Global Patent Index - EP 0719724 B1

EP 0719724 B1 2000-11-08 - Traction sheave elevator and machine space for a traction sheave elevator

Title (en)

Traction sheave elevator and machine space for a traction sheave elevator

Title (de)

Treibscheibenaufzug und Maschinenraum für einen Treibscheibenaufzug

Title (fr)

Ascenseur à poulie et positionnement du moteur pour un ascenseur à poulie

Publication

EP 0719724 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95120246 A

Priority

FI 946143 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719724A1] Traction sheave elevator comprising an elevator car (1) moving along elevator guide rails (10), a counterweight (2) moving along counterweight guide rails (11), and a set of hoisting ropes (3) on which the elevator car and counterweight are suspended. A drive machine unit (6) drives a traction sheave (7) acting on the hoisting ropes (3). The drive machine unit (6) is placed in a machine space (9) provided in the elevator shaft (17) and/or in a wall structure (15) of the elevator shaft and is substantially separated with a wall (14) from the rest of the shaft space. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/00 (2006.01); B66B 7/06 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/04 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/08 (2013.01); B66B 11/0045 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP H0450297 U 19920428

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719724 A1 19960703; EP 0719724 B1 20001108; EP 0719724 B2 20050831; CN 1133261 A 19961016; CN 1155501 C 20040630; DE 69519364 D1 20001214; DE 69519364 T2 20010329; DE 69519364 T3 20060511; DE 719724 T1 19980430; FI 946143 A0 19941228; FI 946143 A 19960629; FI 98296 B 19970214; FI 98296 C 19970526; JP 2877745 B2 19990331; JP H08231163 A 19960910

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-21 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69519364

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-06-02 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2005-08-31 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-01-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519364 20001214

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-08-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONE CORPORATION

1998-04-30 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980127

1996-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960524

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT