Global Patent Index - EP 0719873 B1

EP 0719873 B1 2000-06-21 - Process for manufacturing a shadow mask, made from an iron-nickel alloy

Title (en)

Process for manufacturing a shadow mask, made from an iron-nickel alloy

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Schattenmaske aus einer Eisen-Nickel Legierung

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un masque d'ombre en alliage fer/nickel

Publication

EP 0719873 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402753 A

Priority

FR 9415663 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719873A1] Process for the mfr. of an iron-nickel alloy shadow mask comprises: (a) providing a metal sheet pierced with uniformly distributed hole, the metal sheet comprising an alloy comprising (in wt.%): 35.5-37 Ni; max. 0.5 Co; max. 0.1 Cr; max. 0.1 Cu; max. 0.1 Mo; max. 0.1 V; max. 0.1 Nb; max. 0.1 Mn; 0.03-0.15 Si; max. 0.001 S; 0.0001-0.002 Ca; 0.0001-0.002 Mg; max. 0.005 Al; max. 0.01 O; max. 0.002 C; max. 0.005 N; max. 0.003 P; 0.001 H; max. 0.001 B; balance Fe plus usual impurities, the following relationships satisfied: max. S = 0.02 x Mn + 0.8 x Ca + 0.6 x Mg Cr + Cu + Mo + V + Nb + Si = max. 0.15; (b) heat treating the sheet to obtain a grain size which defined by ASTM E112-88,12.4 is greater or equal to 7 ASTM; and (c) forming the sheet to the required shape. The shadow mask is also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/08; C21D 8/02; H01J 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 6/00 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/08 (2006.01); C22C 38/54 (2006.01); H01J 9/14 (2006.01); H01J 29/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/08 (2013.01); C21D 8/0205 (2013.01); H01J 9/142 (2013.01); C21D 6/001 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0713923 A1 19960529 - IMPHY SA [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719873 A1 19960703; EP 0719873 B1 20000621; CN 1050639 C 20000322; CN 1133896 A 19961023; DE 69517577 D1 20000727; DE 69517577 T2 20010308; DK 0719873 T3 20001023; FR 2728724 A1 19960628; FR 2728724 B1 19970124; JP 2007231423 A 20070913; JP H08333638 A 19961217; KR 100379871 B1 20030619; PL 186742 B1 20040227; PL 312029 A1 19960708; US 5643697 A 19970701

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081207

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081208

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081207

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090105

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-08-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2009-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IMPHY UGINE PRECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080709

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071205

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071211

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071203

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517577

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-27

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK IT LU NL SE

2000-02-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMPHY UGINE PRECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981202

1996-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960715

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK IT LU NL SE