Global Patent Index - EP 0719886 B1

EP 0719886 B1 2000-05-10 - Iron with a thermal detector for measuring the fabric temperature

Title (en)

Iron with a thermal detector for measuring the fabric temperature

Title (de)

Bügeleisen mit einem thermischen Detektor zum Messen der Wäschetemperatur

Title (fr)

Fer à repasser muni d'un détecteur thermique mesurant une température de tissu

Publication

EP 0719886 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95203513 A

Priority

FR 9415871 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719886A1] The smoothing iron has a sole plate (11) for sliding over the fabric, a heater, and a thermal detector (13) for measuring the temp. of the fabric during ironing, and adjusting the temp. accordingly. The detector is fixed to the sole plate and insulated form it by a supple cellular plate (110) with a low level of effusion. The plate is designed to keep the detector thermally isolated form the sole plate and to press it flexibly against the fabric being ironed. It is connected to the sole plate by a rigid, thermally-insulating support (120). The cellular plate can be made from felt, low density silicon foam, a honeycomb material, or a combination of felt and honeycomb material. The support can be in two sections, made form materials with different levels of rigidity. The detector can be coated with a thin layer of polyimide or Teflon (RTM).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01K 1/14 (2006.01); D06F 75/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719886 A1 19960703; EP 0719886 B1 20000510; BR 9506087 A 19971223; CN 1065577 C 20010509; CN 1132285 A 19961002; DE 69516828 D1 20000615; DE 69516828 T2 20001130; FR 2728914 A1 19960705; JP H08224399 A 19960903; SG 54984 A1 20010724; US 5642578 A 19970701

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-02-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031224

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516828

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990226

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970103

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT