Global Patent Index - EP 0719901 B1

EP 0719901 B1 2000-04-05 - Separable low-friction door hinge, particularly for vehicles

Title (en)

Separable low-friction door hinge, particularly for vehicles

Title (de)

Teilbares, reibungsarmes Türscharnier, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Charnière de porte démontable à faible frottement, en particulier pour véhicules

Publication

EP 0719901 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95118868 A

Priority

IT TO940983 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719901A1] A hinge separable into two subunits (2,3) connectable and disconnectable rapidly, a first (3) of which is secured adjustably to the door post (5) of a vehicle body, and a second (2) of which remains connected to the vehicle door (4) to enable the door to be removed and reassembled from/to the vehicle body; the first subunit (3) presents retaining means (15) in turn presenting rolling (21) and plain (22) bearings and designed to receive corresponding connecting means (16) on the second subunit (2) to connect the second subunit to the first subunit in low-friction rotary manner about a common hinge axis; the retaining means permitting the connecting means to slide axially and parallel to the hinge axis in at least one given direction; and a movable connecting element (38) being provided between the two subunits and acting along an axis other than and parallel to the hinge axis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/1005 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719901 A1 19960703; EP 0719901 B1 20000405; DE 69516103 D1 20000511; DE 69516103 T2 20001109; IT 1267180 B1 19970128; IT TO940983 A1 19960603; IT TO940983 D0 19941201

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-08-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-07-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011130

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001103

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001102

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-11-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001101

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516103 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2000-04-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000405

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981008

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961025

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE