Global Patent Index - EP 0719912 B1

EP 0719912 B1 2000-02-02 - Exhaust gas treatment device of internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Exhaust gas treatment device of internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Abgasbehandlungsvorrichtung für Verbrennungsmotorenabgase

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traitement de gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0719912 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118909 A

Priority

  • DE 4447278 A
  • DE 19511503 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719912A1] The device's intermediate chamber (22) between the two gas treatment housings (20) is bounded on its circumference by a wire mat (36) which consists of austenitic steel wire with a thickness of at least 0.1 mm. The wire mat comprises a wire gauze with the threads running inclined to the longitudinal direction of the casing (4), or may comprise a wire knit construction. The wire may be single-layered with overlapping in the circumferential direction, or may be multi-layered.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/02 (2010.01); F01N 13/14 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2857 (2013.01); F01N 3/2864 (2013.01); F01N 13/0097 (2014.06); F01N 13/14 (2013.01); F01N 2310/02 (2013.01); F01N 2450/02 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0223022 A2 19870527 - MAN TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719912 A1 19960703; EP 0719912 B1 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081231

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2003-12-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-09-06 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2002-08-30 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2002-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507742 20000309

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

1998-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980427

1997-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO.

1997-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961120

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE