Global Patent Index - EP 0719985 B1

EP 0719985 B1 2000-05-03 - Oil burner of the automatic combustion reduction type

Title (en)

Oil burner of the automatic combustion reduction type

Title (de)

Ölbrenner mit automatischer Verbrennungsreduktion

Title (fr)

Brûleur à huile du type à réduction de combustion automatique

Publication

EP 0719985 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94309857 A

Priority

EP 94309857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719985A1] An oil burner of the automatic combustion reduction type which is capable of automatically controlling a temperature in a room in which the oil burner is placed. A thermistor 34 detects an increase in temperature in which a temperature in a room in which the oil burner is placed to a predetermined level, so that a solenoid 38 is actuated. This causes a wick 24 to be moved from a combustion increased position to a combustion decreased position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/00; F24C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/00 (2006.01); F24C 5/06 (2006.01); F23N 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23N 1/005 (2013.01); F24C 5/06 (2013.01); F23N 5/14 (2013.01); F23N 2025/12 (2013.01); F23N 2031/14 (2013.01); F23N 2037/10 (2013.01); F23N 2037/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719985 A1 19960703; EP 0719985 B1 20000503; DE 69424296 D1 20000608; DE 69424296 T2 20010118; ES 2148292 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141229

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-01-07 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20141228

2014-12-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69424296

2014-12-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69424296

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131104

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148292 T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424296 20000608

2000-06-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL

1997-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970424

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961129

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL