Global patent index - EP 0719988 B1

EP 0719988 B1 2000-07-05 - A fume and vapour removal setup

Title (en)

A fume and vapour removal setup

Title (de)

Rauch- und Dampfabzugseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'évacuation de vapeurs et de fumées

Publication

EP 0719988 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95500172 A

Priority

ES 9402648 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719988A2] The setup comprises a succession of pipe lenghts (10), (11), (12), (13), (14), (15) connected with each other in order to form the general structure of a fume and vapour piping. The passage cross-sectionj of the different pipe lenghts remains aproximately constant all along the piping and is equivalent to that of the outlet of the fume and vapour hood or exhaust device (18). Terminal (20) which is coaxial to the outlet and provided with a grating, includes means to facilitate during the operation of said fume and vapour hood or exhaust device (18) a free passage of the fumes or vapours through the outlet end of the piping. Pipe lenghts, including the bends, consist in sensibly flattened elements one of whose walls (21) is flat and apt to rest on a flat surface whereas at least another of their walls (22) is bulged towards the outside. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719988 A2 19960703; EP 0719988 A3 19970212; EP 0719988 B1 20000705; DE 69517784 D1 20000810; ES 2122835 A1 19981216; ES 2122835 B1 19990701

INPADOC legal status

2001-09-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2001-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-10-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517784

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-10

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2000-07-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990224

1997-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970714

1997-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT