Global Patent Index - EP 0719989 B1

EP 0719989 B1 2000-08-02 - Wall mounted gas heater with a small sanitary water storage tank

Title (en)

Wall mounted gas heater with a small sanitary water storage tank

Title (de)

Wandgasheizkessel mit kleinem Brauchwasserspeicher

Title (fr)

Chaudière murale mixte à gaz avec un mini-ballon accumulateur d'eau chaude sanitaire

Publication

EP 0719989 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402958 A

Priority

FR 9415855 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0719989A1] A burner (2) heats the central-heating boiler (1) directly. Hot water is continuously available (11) from a boiler heat-exchanger (7), via a small (under 20 1) cylinder (10). If its measured (17) flow exceeds a set value, a two-way valve (5) diverts the radiator circuit (4,3) through a by-pass (12), and, in summer, the burner lights to heat the cylinder make-up water, temperature-regulated at the boiler (15). During idle periods, cylinder temperature is maintained by a local thermostat (16), similarly activating the burner and by-pass. An indirect coil (13) in the latter - opt., a small electric heater - transfers the heat required. The burner does not light for brief or low-volume demands, through repeated draw-offs will initiate reheating as cylinder temperature falls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/08; F24H 1/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/08 (2006.01); F24H 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/48 (2013.01); F24D 3/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0719989 A1 19960703; EP 0719989 B1 20000802; AT 195175 T 20000815; DE 69518216 D1 20000907; DE 69518216 T2 20010329; ES 2151038 T3 20001216; FR 2728960 A1 19960705; FR 2728960 B1 19970228

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091229

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110308

2011-03-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110309

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091228

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091228

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091228

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. SAUNIER DUVAL EAU CHAUDE CHAUFFAGE *SDECC

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081204

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081208

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-12-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051228

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151038 T3

2000-11-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-10-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518216 20000907

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT NL

2000-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195175 T 20000815

1998-05-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980408

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961202

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB IT NL