EP 0720089 A1 19960703 - Method and system for recalling desktop states in a data processing system
Title (en)
Method and system for recalling desktop states in a data processing system
Title (de)
Verfahren und System zur Zurückführung von Desktop-Zuständen in einem Datenverarbeitungssystem
Title (fr)
Méthode et système pour rappeler des états du bureau (desktop) dans un système de traitement de données
Publication
Application
Priority
US 36653194 A 19941230
Abstract (en)
A method and system are disclosed for recalling a previous desktop state of a data processing system, where a desktop state specifies a dependence hierarchy and visual arrangement of a number of graphical objects representative of operating system functions and data processing applications that are displayed within a display device of the data processing system. The system of the present invention detects each occurrence of a desktop event which creates a new desktop state. In response to detecting an occurrence of a desktop event, the system records the new desktop state. In response to a particular user input, the system automatically returns the desktop to a selected state previous to the current desktop state by referencing the recorded desktop states, wherein all operating system functions and data processing applications available at the selected state are enabled. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G06F 3/048 (2013.01); G06F 3/033 (2006.01); G06F 3/0484 (2013.01); G06F 3/14 (2006.01); G06F 9/44 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G06F 3/0481 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] EP 0621528 A1 19941026 - MICROSOFT CORP [US]
- [A] "INVISIBLE LOGICAL DESKTOP VIEWS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 349, 1 May 1993 (1993-05-01), pages 310, XP000377217
- [A] "SAVING CONTENTS OF INTERACTIVE DEVELOPMENT SCREEN", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 315, 1 July 1990 (1990-07-01), pages 539, XP000134117
- [A] "AUTOMATIC DESKTOP MANIPULATION BASED ON CALENDAR EVENTS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 36, no. 8, 1 August 1993 (1993-08-01), pages 327, XP000390240
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0720089 A1 19960703; JP H08234951 A 19960913; US 5692143 A 19971125
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 95119049 A 19951204; JP 34014695 A 19951227; US 36653194 A 19941230