Global Patent Index - EP 0720136 B1

EP 0720136 B1 2000-03-22 - Device for arming an alarm system and for monitoring an entry door

Title (en)

Device for arming an alarm system and for monitoring an entry door

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Scharfstellen einer Alarmanlage und zur Überwachung einer Eingangstür

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour armer un système d'alarme et pour surveiller une porte d'entrée

Publication

EP 0720136 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95120068 A

Priority

DE 4445730 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0720136A2] The setting device allows an intruder alarm with a central device and a number of spaced detectors to be set automatically when at least one access door is locked, using switches (S1,S2,S3) incorporated in the door frame (5). A first switch (S1) is closed when the door is closed, a second switch (S2) closed when the locking bolt (1) for the door is operated and a third switch (S3) is closed when the locking bolt reaches its fully locked position. The signals from the switches are fed to a control device, providing the control signal for setting the alarm when all 3 switches are closed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/22; E05B 45/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 45/08 (2006.01); G08B 13/22 (2006.01); E05B 45/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/008 (2013.01); E05B 45/083 (2013.01); E05B 2045/0695 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0720136 A2 19960703; EP 0720136 A3 19960731; EP 0720136 B1 20000322; AT 191094 T 20000415; DE 4445730 A1 19960718

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151218

2016-01-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20151218

2015-12-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59508054

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101231

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101219

2011-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.

- Free text: GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.#DE BOELELAAN 7 OFF. I 2 HG#1083HJ AMSTERDAM (NL) -TRANSFER TO- GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.#DE BOELELAAN 7 OFF. I 2 HG#1083HJ AMSTERDAM (NL)

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-03-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-03-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-10-29 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.

- Free text: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#KURGARTENSTRASSE 37#90762 FUERTH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.#DE BOELELAAN 7 OFF. I 2 HG#1083HJ AMSTERDAM (NL)

2003-07-23 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20030522

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-23 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2001-02-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EFFEFF ALARM GMBH

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-12-27 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-12-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508054 20000427

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191094 T 20000415

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990223

1997-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1996-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961022

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI