Global Patent Index - EP 0720191 B1

EP 0720191 B1 2000-03-22 - Sliding rocker for electric switches or mechanisms

Title (en)

Sliding rocker for electric switches or mechanisms

Title (de)

Gleitende Wippeinrichtung für elektrische Schalter oder Mechanismen

Title (fr)

Organe basculant à glisser pour interrupteurs ou mécanismes électriques

Publication

EP 0720191 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94500209 A

Priority

EP 94500209 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0720191A1] The mechanical unit has an upper arm section (3) centrally pivoting on a pivot arm (2). Each side of the arm has a holder (3a,3c) for a pushbutton. The base of the unit has a sliding section holder (5). A spring (7) fits into the holder and is held in place by a U-shaped clip (16) which clips into the holder top. The base of the clip (23) sits in a cup shaped section with electrical contacts on its outer. As the upper arm is moved, so the clip swings round and closes/opens the contacts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 23/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0720191 A1 19960703; EP 0720191 B1 20000322; AT 191096 T 20000415; DE 69423638 D1 20000427; ES 2144499 T3 20000616; PT 720191 E 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121230

2014-03-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140306

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-07-08 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20111123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-07-27 [REG ES GC2A] EXPLOITATION CERTIFICATE REGISTERED APPLICATION WITH SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090714

2001-10-03 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC ESPANA

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001229

2000-12-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001229

2000-09-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-06-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000624

2000-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144499 T3

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423638 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191096 T 20000415

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990407

1998-12-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC ESPANA, S.A.

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961216

1996-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATERIAL DE INSTALACION EUNEA, S.A.

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE