Global Patent Index - EP 0720250 B1

EP 0720250 B1 2000-03-01 - Antenna for an automobile and an active impedance adaptor for such an antenna

Title (en)

Antenna for an automobile and an active impedance adaptor for such an antenna

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugantenne und Anpassungsvorrichtung mit aktiver Impedanz für eine solche Antenne

Title (fr)

Antenne pour véhicule automobile et ensemble adaptateur actif d'impédance pour une telle antenne

Publication

EP 0720250 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402681 A

Priority

FR 9415928 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0720250A1] The antenna has a mounting (30) which is fixed to part of the bodywork (40) of a vehicle and accepts a coaxial cable termination (20). The coaxial cable termination comprises an earthing ring (21,22), an insulating ring (23) and an annular core (24) connected to the core (26) of the cable (27). The signal picked up by the antenna is passed to a threaded rod (31) through an opening (41) in the bodywork and the central opening of the cable termination. Around this opening, the insulating ring has a centering surface (44) which co-operates with an element (42) integral with the rod. The opening in the annular core differs from that of the contour of the threaded rod so as to leave an insulating space between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1214 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0720250 A1 19960703; EP 0720250 B1 20000301; DE 69515281 D1 20000406; DE 69515281 T2 20001130; ES 2143024 T3 20000501; FR 2729010 A1 19960705; FR 2729010 B1 19970411

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111129

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69515281

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111129

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111129

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101112

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-20 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2143024 T3

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515281 20000406

2000-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

1999-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOCIETE DE COMPOSANTS ELECTRIQUES

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980206

1996-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960715

1996-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT