Global patent index - EP 0720583 B1

EP 0720583 B1 2000-04-05 - TUBULAR CORE ASSEMBLIES FOR ROLLS OF PAPER OR OTHER SHEET MATERIAL

Title (en)

TUBULAR CORE ASSEMBLIES FOR ROLLS OF PAPER OR OTHER SHEET MATERIAL

Title (de)

ROHRFÖRMIGER KERNAUFBAU FÜR ROLLEN AUS PAPIER ODER ANDEREM FLACHEM MATERIAL

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLES NOYAUX TUBULAIRES POUR ROULEAUX DE PAPIER ET AUTRES MATERIAUX EN FEUILLES

Publication

EP 0720583 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93917503 A

Priority

CA 9300336 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: FI109683B] Paper roll core tube (62) comprises wrapped paperboard, and has two opposite end notches (72, 74) which receive respective lugs (68, 70) on an annular metal or plastic end member (66) with a chuck projection receiving notch (76) midway between its lugs. Opt. the core tube end is reinforced by an inner sleeve of non-isotropic material having notches in register with the tube end notches. Pref. rectangular lugs closely fit into rectangular notches.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/10; B65H 75/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/10 (2006.01); B65H 75/18 (2006.01); B65H 75/30 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

B31C (2006.01); B65H (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/187 (2013.01); B65H 75/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

AT 191429 T 20000415; DE 69328313 D1 20000511; DE 69328313 T2 20000914; EP 0720583 A1 19960710; EP 0720583 B1 20000405; FI 109683 B 20020930; FI 960703 A0 19960216; FI 960703 A 19960216; JP 3612333 B2 20050119; JP H09503986 A 19970422; NO 308891 B1 20001113; NO 960573 A 19960402; NO 960573 D0 19960214; NO 991107 A 19960402; NO 991107 D0 19990305

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070816

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070817

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070816

2008-04-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-07-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-07-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-07-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-08-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030816

2002-09-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-08-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020830

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-08-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69328313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL SE

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191429

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1997-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961218

1996-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KEWIN, DANIEL D.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KEWIN, DANIEL D.

1996-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960304

1996-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB NL SE