Global Patent Index - EP 0720962 B1

EP 0720962 B1 2001-04-04 - Winch with coupling suitable for free fall brake

Title (en)

Winch with coupling suitable for free fall brake

Title (de)

Winde mit einer als Freifallbremse verwendbaren Kupplung

Title (fr)

Treuil avec embrayage utilisable comme frein de la chute libre

Publication

EP 0720962 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95120468 A

Priority

DE 4446443 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0720962A1] The first reduction stage (42) is driven either by a motor (15) or by hand with a crank (53). This stage carries the primary element (48a) of the lamellar clutch. The second stage (22) engages the winch drum (2). The winch has four modes of operation: motor power, manual rapid, manual slow and descent under gravity. The coupling can be engaged to complete the transmission train or disengaged to form a lamellar viscous dissipater, with relative rotation between the primary (48a) and secondary (48b) elements. A system of weights (13) and levers (50) governed by centrifugal force, acts on the primary dissipater element (48a) to adjust the clearance between the fins and thus the friction. This clearance can also be adjusted by means of a lever (60) to control the rate of descent under gravity. The lever also toggles determines the mode of operation by engaging splines in different stages (55-58) by axial displacement of the crank shaft (54).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 5/04 (2013.01); B66D 1/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4446443 A1 19960627; DE 4446443 C2 19961002; AT 200267 T 20010415; DK 0720962 T3 20010507; EP 0720962 A1 19960710; EP 0720962 B1 20010404; NO 311294 B1 20011112; NO 955212 A 19960624; NO 955212 D0 19951221

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120701

2013-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 200267 T

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111223

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-07-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-07-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120701

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101229

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101214

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20101210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110104

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-12-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-07 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200267 T 20010415

2001-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000629

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960731

1996-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK FR GB IT LI NL SE