Global Patent Index - EP 0721026 B1

EP 0721026 B1 2000-10-25 - Machine and installation for performing operations on a railway track

Title (en)

Machine and installation for performing operations on a railway track

Title (de)

Maschine und Anlage zur Durchführung von Gleisbauarbeiten

Title (fr)

Machine et installation pour l'exécution de travaux de voie ferrée

Publication

EP 0721026 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95890212 A

Priority

AT 895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0721026A1] The machine chassis (2) is mounted on rail bogies (2), and comprises first and second working areas (9,10) between them and connected directly together. Lengthwise rails (15) on the chassis are provided for a self-propelled transporting unit (18). In the first working area, the chassis comprises two parallel lengthwise girders (13) joined together only by cross-members (14) above the rails. The unit travels from the second working area to the first and under the cross-members. In the first area, the girders can be cranked upwards, the cross-members being situated at the ends of the higher-level portion. In both areas the rails can be in a plane immediately above the bogies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 29/05 (2006.01); E01B 29/00 (2006.01); E01B 29/02 (2006.01); E01B 29/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 29/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0721026 A1 19960710; EP 0721026 B1 20001025; AT 197179 T 20001115; AU 4078696 A 19960711; AU 706712 B2 19990624; CA 2166438 A1 19960704; CA 2166438 C 20051129; CZ 281767 B6 19970115; CZ 9503503 A3 19960814; DE 59508811 D1 20001130; DK 0721026 T3 20001127; FI 118974 B 20080530; FI 960009 A0 19960102; FI 960009 A 19960704; RU 2105835 C1 19980227; US 5590601 A 19970107

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131201

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508811

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 197179 T

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-06-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20131130

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121011

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121206

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508811 20001130

2000-11-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2000-10-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197179 T 20001115

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981215

1996-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951207

1996-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE