Global Patent Index - EP 0721034 B1

EP 0721034 B1 2000-10-04 - Improvements for a removable fence

Title (en)

Improvements for a removable fence

Title (de)

Verbesserung für einen abnehmbaren Zaun

Title (fr)

Perfectionnement pour clôture démontable

Publication

EP 0721034 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96410001 A

Priority

FR 9500136 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0721034A1] The fence consists of posts (19) with two or more rails (3) between them, and a panel (2) of a supple deformable material between the rails. The panel is made from a synthetic material such as woven polyester coated with PVC, and it has a series of slits (17) in it. It is fitted to the rails by rods contained in hemmed edges of the panel engaging with lengthwise slots in the rails. The posts and rails are made from a plastic, e.g. polyamide, polypropylene, PVC or a loaded polypropylene copolymer. They can be made from recycled materials with additives giving them resistance to UV rays. Joints (31) for the components can be made e.g. from polyacetal copolymer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/1421 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0721034 A1 19960710; EP 0721034 B1 20001004; DE 69610512 D1 20001109; FR 2728927 A1 19960705; FR 2728927 B1 19970307

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-02-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-04 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2001-01-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010105

2000-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610512 20001109

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2000-10-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980406

1998-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980406

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961213

1996-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI