Global Patent Index - EP 0721239 B1

EP 0721239 B1 2000-05-24 - Manufacturing process for an electrical cable connector, electrical cable and high-voltage transformer provided with such cables

Title (en)

Manufacturing process for an electrical cable connector, electrical cable and high-voltage transformer provided with such cables

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren für einen Kabelsteckverbinder, elektrisches Kabel und Hochspannungstransformator mit solchen Kabeln

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un connecteur pour câble, câble électrique et transformateur haute tension muni de tels câbles

Publication

EP 0721239 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95402909 A

Priority

FR 9500070 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0721239A1] The method involves surrounding a multistrand twisted conductive core (21) by a coaxial plastic insulating sheath (22) which is stripped at one end so that the core can be threaded through the central hole (24) of a thin metallic disc (23). Spikes (26) preferably distributed uniformly in a ring around the central hole are driven into the end face of the sheath to secure the disc to the end of the cable. Conductive solder (e.g. Sn-Pb alloy) deposited on to the cable core is drawn by capillary attraction into the spaces between its strands, and covers the tapered neck (25) around the hole which guides the insertion of the core.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/28; H01R 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/42 (2006.01); H01R 4/02 (2006.01); H01R 43/28 (2006.01); H02G 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/28 (2013.01); H01R 4/028 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49179 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49213 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0236642 A1 19870916 - OREGA ELECTRO MECANIQUE [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0721239 A1 19960710; EP 0721239 B1 20000524; DE 69517146 D1 20000629; DE 69517146 T2 20010125; FR 2729254 A1 19960712; FR 2729254 B1 19970307; IN 186276 B 20010728; JP H08265952 A 19961011; US 5750928 A 19980512

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-08-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041221

2004-12-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041221

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-11-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031110

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-01-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030120

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-04 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20011126

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-08-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517146 20000629

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980526

1998-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON TELEVISION COMPONENTS FRANCE

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970203

1996-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT