Global Patent Index - EP 0721304 B1

EP 0721304 B1 2000-09-13 - SAFETY BELT BUCKLE

Title (en)

SAFETY BELT BUCKLE

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSS FÜR SICHERHEITSGURTE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE POUR CEINTURE DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 0721304 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95927723 A

Priority

  • DE 4427011 A
  • EP 9502945 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4427011A1] Simple measures prevent a safety belt buckle based on the proven twist lock design from being affected by tensioning of the belt. The twist lock (16) is secured in its closed position by a locking plate (20). The locking plate (20) is in turn secured by two locking balls (36) held between a trough (28) in the locking plate and a blocking plate (30) movable in the parallel direction to the locking plate. In order to open the buckle, this blocking plate (30) must first be actuated by means of a mass-compensated system. This buckle is secured against extremely high accelerations in all directions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 11/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/2523 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45644 (2013.01); Y10T 24/45665 (2013.01); Y10T 24/4567 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4427011 A1 19960201; CN 1131381 A 19960918; CZ 9600921 A3 19960911; EP 0721304 A1 19960717; EP 0721304 B1 20000913; ES 2093588 T1 19970101; ES 2093588 T3 20010116; JP 2823360 B2 19981111; JP H08509902 A 19961022; KR 0180713 B1 19990201; PL 313705 A1 19960722; US 5915633 A 19990629; WO 9603896 A1 19960215

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050725

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020810

2003-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-03-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-07-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2093588 T3

2001-01-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508715 20001019

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1998-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980824

1998-06-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRW OCCUPANT RESTRAINT SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

1997-01-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2093588 T1

1996-10-10 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

1996-09-18 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

1996-09-13 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Representative's name: ING.A.RACHELI & C.S.R.L.

1996-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960425

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE