Global patent index - EP 0721392 B1

EP 0721392 B1 2000-02-23 - CUSHIONING CONVERSION MACHINE INCLUDING A CUTTING/ALIGNING ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

CUSHIONING CONVERSION MACHINE INCLUDING A CUTTING/ALIGNING ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

POLSTERUMWANDLUNGSMASCHINE, AUSGERÜSTET MIT EINEM ZUSAMMENBAU ZUM SCHNEIDEN UND AUSRICHTEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE CONVERSION EN GARNITURE D'EMBALLAGE COMPRENANT UN ENSEMBLE DE COUPE ET D'ALIGNEMENT

Publication

EP 0721392 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94925941 A

Priority

  • US 9409344 W
  • US 11034993 A
  • US 18830594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9505928A1] A cushioning conversion machine (20), which converts stock material (11) into cut sections (P) of dunnage, includes a cutting/aligning assembly (56). The cutting/aligning assembly (56) comprises a moving blade unit (73) which is mounted on the frame (36) in such a manner that it travels between a rest position and a cutting position whereat it cuts a dunnage strip (5) (which is emerging from a dunnage outlet opening (48)) into a cut section. The cutting/aligning assembly (56) also includes an automatic alignment device (80) which automatically aligns the cut section with the dunnage outlet opening (48) when the blade unit (73) is moved from the cutting position to the rest position. The automatic alignment device (80) is unattached to the moving blade member (72) but travels therewith during jamfree operation of the cushioning conversion machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 1/08 (2006.01); B26D 1/30 (2006.01); B26D 5/18 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B31B 1/16 (2006.01); B31D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31D 5/0047 (2013.01); B26D 1/08 (2013.01); B26D 1/30 (2013.01); B26D 5/18 (2013.01); B26D 7/06 (2013.01); B31D 2205/0023 (2013.01); B31D 2205/0047 (2013.01); B31D 2205/0058 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9505928 A1 19950302; AU 7569594 A 19950321; BR 9407308 A 19961008; DE 69423108 D1 20000330; DE 69423108 T2 20000824; EP 0721392 A1 19960717; EP 0721392 B1 20000223; JP H09504479 A 19970506

INPADOC legal status

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140820

2014-08-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69423108

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-05-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-04-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030819

2004-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-08-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030819

2002-07-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020715

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020712

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69423108

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-30

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990126

1997-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RANPAK CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960216

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL