Global Patent Index - EP 0721421 B1

EP 0721421 B1 2000-06-28 - REFUSE TRUCK

Title (en)

REFUSE TRUCK

Title (de)

MÜLLFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

CAMION DE COLLECTE

Publication

EP 0721421 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94928215 A

Priority

  • AU 9400576 W
  • AU PM149693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9509119A1] There is disclosed a refuse handling apparatus in a refuse collection vehicle particularly adapted for recyclable refuse including at least two separate compartments for receiving a different type of refuse such as selected recyclable materials, each compartment being fitted with a compactor device adapted to a system filling the compartments in which the compactor device (12, 13) includes a pair of reciprocating paddles (12, 13) mounted for arcuate movement about a drive shaft, the paddles including sensing means for sensing the compaction of refuse material in the compartments. A different compaction force is applied to each compartment. At least one of the compartments including rake device (14, 15) mounted for reciprocal movement in the compartment to apply force to the refuse in a single direction away from the loading area. The refuse collection vehicle includes adjacent the discharge end of the container an overload area (17) into which excess refuse material can be selectively transferred from either of the compartments (for example, via pivoting flaps (18, 19)).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/14; B65F 3/00; B65F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/00 (2006.01); B65F 3/14 (2006.01); B65F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/14 (2013.01); B65F 3/001 (2013.01); B65F 3/206 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9509119 A1 19950406; AT 194126 T 20000715; DE 69425062 D1 20000803; DE 69425062 T2 20010322; DK 0721421 T3 20000828; EP 0721421 A1 19960717; EP 0721421 A4 19980527; EP 0721421 B1 20000628; ES 2147795 T3 20001001; NZ 273879 A 19971124

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-08 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20140927

2014-09-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69425062

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070904

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2005-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050927

2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-07-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2001-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-05-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000928

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MACDONALD JOHNSTON ENGINEERING CY PTY. LTD

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-12-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147795 T3

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-09-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-08-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.P.A.

2000-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425062 20000803

2000-07-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194126 T 20000715

1999-11-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REFUSE TRUCK

1999-10-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REFUSE TRUCK

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990308

1998-05-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980406

1998-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960426

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE