Global Patent Index - EP 0721538 B1

EP 0721538 B1 2001-05-23 - LIFTGATE LATCH

Title (en)

LIFTGATE LATCH

Title (de)

FALLENSCHLOSS FÜR ABSCHLIESSBARES KAROSSERIETEIL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE PORTES RELEVABLES

Publication

EP 0721538 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94928664 A

Priority

  • US 9410841 W
  • US 12951593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9509289A1] A device which establishes a sequence for the modes of operation of a door. The sequence is latched, ajar, open and safety. The modes of operation are achieved by the interaction of a striker (16) and a striker forkbolt (20). The striker forkbolt (20) is secured to the door and the striker (16) is secured to the fixed structure. The striker forkbolt (20) is rotatable about a first axis (22) to various predetermined angular positions. The striker catch may be restricted to various rotational positions to accomplish one of the four modes of operation. A first angular restriction of the striker catch in which the striker forkbolt (20) is engaged with a striker (16) defines the latched mode of operation. A second angular restriction allows unrestricted rotation of the striker forkbolt (20) between the first limit of rotation and a maximum limit of rotation in which the striker forkbolt (20) and the striker (16) may be disengaged upon application of a force attempting to displace the door to an ajar position. A third range of angular positions of the striker forkbolt (20) occurs upon rotation of the striker forkbolt (20) to the maximum limit of rotation whereupon the striker forkbolt (20) and the striker (16) are completely disengaged permitting the door to be positioned in an open mode of operation. The fourth range of angular positions occurs in which the striker catch is restricted to a second limit of rotation in which the striker forkbolt (20) engages the striker (16) defining a safety mode of operation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/19 (2006.01); E05B 65/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 83/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/20 (2013.01); E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 85/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9509289 A1 19950406; DE 69427302 D1 20010628; DE 69427302 T2 20011206; EP 0721538 A1 19960717; EP 0721538 B1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070926

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070926

2006-11-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061102

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427302 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960808

1996-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960425

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB