Global Patent Index - EP 0721747 B1

EP 0721747 B1 2000-06-07 - Hair curler

Title (en)

Hair curler

Title (de)

Lockenwickel

Title (fr)

Bigoudi

Publication

EP 0721747 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95108609 A

Priority

CH 6695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0721747A1] A hair curler with an elongated body (c) for setting waves in wet, damp or dry hair; the aerated and elastic body (c) is covered in whole or in part by an aerated elastic sheath (6) provided in its central part with protruding filament-like elements (8) to facilitate winding hair onto the curler. The ends (9,11;19,20) of the curler body are fitted with interlocking elements (10;22) which allow the curler to be locked into a circular or semi-circular shape after the hair has been wound onto it. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 2/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 2/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 2/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0721747 A1 19960717; EP 0721747 B1 20000607; CH 687120 A5 19960930; DE 69517403 D1 20000713; DE 69517403 T2 20010118; DE 721747 T1 19970430; ES 2093580 T1 19970101; ES 2093580 T3 20001101

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110606

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100607

2011-11-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111118

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100606

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100606

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100611

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090703

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090616

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090629

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2093580

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517403

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980924

1997-04-30 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970113

1997-01-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2093580

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

1996-12-27 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

1996-12-02 [ITCL] IT: TRANSLATION FOR EP CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITCL

- Representative's name: MARIETTI & GISLON S.R.L.

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT