Global patent index - EP 0721871 B1

EP 0721871 B1 2000-03-01 - Device for pivoting a protection flap at an automatic central buffer coupling for railway vehicles with a guide horn projecting over the front side of the coupling

Title (en)

Device for pivoting a protection flap at an automatic central buffer coupling for railway vehicles with a guide horn projecting over the front side of the coupling

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Verschwenken einer Schutzklappe an einer selbsttätigen Mittelpufferkupplung für Schienenfahrzeuge mit über die Stirnfläche hinausragendem Kupplungsgreifer

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour pivoter un clapet de protection d'un attelage automatique à tampon central d'un véhicule ferroviaire avec un levier de guidage saillant sur la partie frontale d'attelage

Publication

EP 0721871 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95119917 A

Priority

DE 19501009 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0721871A1] A flat mainly level control flap (3) is fastened hinged below the coupling head (5), to project over it at the front. The flap is mainly located on the side of the head, which is opposite to the coupling grab relative to the longitudinal centre plane of the coupling. It thereby extends into the grab area of the coupling grab of the counter coupling. The control flap is connected to a control unit with a control link (7), which engages on the protective flap (1) via a lever drive (10) to move it between two positions. When in pivoted-in position, the flap is located parallel to and in front of end face of the coupling head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61G 5/06; B61G 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/06 (2006.01); B61G 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 5/06 (2013.01); B61G 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0721871 A1 19960717; EP 0721871 B1 20000301; AT 190020 T 20000315; DE 19501009 A1 19960718; ES 2144094 T3 20000601

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091217

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091217

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091216

2011-03-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110303

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091216

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144094

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507906

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-06

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL SE

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190020

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-03-03 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: SCHARFENBERGKUPPLUNG GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1998-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980218

1996-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960821

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL SE