Global Patent Index - EP 0721990 B1

EP 0721990 B1 2001-02-28 - Method of producing alloyed steels and arc furnace installation with positionable blowing lances therefor

Title (en)

Method of producing alloyed steels and arc furnace installation with positionable blowing lances therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von legierten Stählen und Elektroofenanlage mit verstellbaren Frischlanzen dafür

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'élaboration d'aciers alliés et installation de four électrique à arc incluyant des lances de soufflage positionables pour sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 0721990 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96890007 A

Priority

AT 5595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0721990A1] Alloy steels are made in a two stage electro-furnace treatment. The first stage is carried out in a furnace (1) where iron-carrying material is decarburised and dephosphorised by blowing with oxygen. The slag is removed from the melt before passing the latter to another furnace (16) where alloying material is added with the help of oxygen and inert gas to establish the correct alloy and carbon content.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 5/52; C21C 7/068

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 7/06 (2006.01); C21C 5/52 (2006.01); C21C 7/064 (2006.01); C21C 7/068 (2006.01); C22C 33/00 (2006.01); C21C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/5264 (2013.01); C21C 5/5252 (2013.01); C21C 7/0685 (2013.01); C21C 2007/0093 (2013.01); Y10S 75/961 (2013.01); Y10S 75/962 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0721990 A1 19960717; EP 0721990 B1 20010228; AT 403293 B 19971229; AT A5595 A 19970515; BR 9600097 A 19980127; CN 1134984 A 19961106; DE 59606475 D1 20010405; JP 4195106 B2 20081210; JP H08225880 A 19960903; TR 9600032 A2 19960821; TW 363081 B 19990701; US 6077324 A 20000620; ZA 9600281 B 19960731

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100112

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110111

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606475

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110111

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110111

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100115

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-08-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-08-28 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2009-08-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-05-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606475 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAI TECHNOMETAL GMBH

2000-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF PRODUCING ALLOYED STEELS AND ARC FURNACE INSTALLATION WITH POSITIONABLE BLOWING LANCES THEREFOR

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980504

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970117

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE