Global Patent Index - EP 0722013 B1

EP 0722013 B1 2000-03-22 - Method and apparatus for carrying out railway track works

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for carrying out railway track works

Title (de)

Verfahren und Gleisbaumaschine zur Durchführung von Gleisbauarbeiten

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la réalisation de travaux de voies ferrées

Publication

EP 0722013 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95890216 A

Priority

AT 2495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0722013A1] The track maintenance system measures the actual position of the rail track (5) at a defined point (69), upstream of the maintenance point (68), relative to a spaced reference position (20), with the measured value being stored, for comparison with a subsequently measured value for the same point, obtained after working on the track. The track maintenance device (7) is maintained in operation as long as the compared position values are the same. Pref. the reference position for the actual track position measurement is provided by an adjacent rail track to that being worked on.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 35/00 (2013.01); E01B 2203/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0722013 A1 19960717; EP 0722013 B1 20000322; AT 191032 T 20000415; DE 59508056 D1 20000427; DK 0722013 T3 20000710

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141206

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141207

2015-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131206

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508056

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131206

2014-07-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59508056

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121206

2013-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 191032 T

- Effective date: 20121206

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101109

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20090401

2005-12-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051206

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508056 20000427

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191032 T 20000415

1999-02-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981229

1996-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951212

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI SE