Global Patent Index - EP 0722021 B1

EP 0722021 B1 2000-05-31 - Method of protecting buildings by autarc vertical air flows

Title (en)

Method of protecting buildings by autarc vertical air flows

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Schutz von Bauten mittels vertikaler, energieautarker Windströme

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la protection de bâtiments au moyen de courants d'air autarciques verticaux

Publication

EP 0722021 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100277 A

Priority

DE 19500463 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19500463A1] The process uses suitably designed spoilers (5) for conversion of horizontal detrimental material contg. wind stream into vertical, high velocity ones. Thus the buildings behind the spoilers are protected against the effect of the horizontal winds independently of the spoiler shape and addition of electrostatic filters. Pref. the spoiler structure may be inserted also in smog-laden atmos. of towns and city regions for a vertical air flow deflection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/62; E04H 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 9/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB GR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19500463 A1 19950803; EP 0722021 A2 19960717; EP 0722021 A3 19970514; EP 0722021 B1 20000531

INPADOC legal status


2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-10-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB GR IT

2000-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980205

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970610

1997-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB GR IT

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB GR IT